Katz, Miriam (CPSO#: 50892)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite B710 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017