Katz, Peter Stewart (CPSO#: 28532)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Oct 2004
Summary:

 On October 15, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Katz to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered the 
 following:

1)	That Dr. Katz attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.

2)	The 
 Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Katz pay costs to the College in the amount of 
 	$2,500.00.

3)	The Discipline Committee ordered that the results of this proceeding be recorded 
 on the 	public register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 15, 2004

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: October 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

As of October 3, 2017, the State of Florida Department of Health ordered an emergency suspension of Dr. Peter Katz’s license to practice medicine in the State of Florida on the basis that his continued practice of medicine represents an immediate, serious danger to the public, by failing to meet the minimum standard of care, prescribing legend drugs to patients without adequate medical justification, prescribing controlled substances to a narcotic-seeking patient and prescribing controlled substances and urine drug tests to sober home residents in exchange for cash. The College was notified of this suspension on October 4, 2017.