Katz, Richard Lorne (CPSO#: 59205)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Nov 1992