Katzman, Martin Allan (CPSO#: 63918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N4
Phone: (416) 598-9344
Fax: (416) 598-8198
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ALLAN KATZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992