Katznelson, Rita (CPSO#: 78825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Taskent Medical Institute, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street G PMB 106E
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6273
Fax: (416) 340-4481
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2863 Ellesmere Road, Suite 110
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 287-0990
Fax: (416) 298-0992
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katznelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Katznelson ( CPSO# 78825 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Corporation Name: Clarke/Katznelson/Marinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Clarke ( CPSO# 79400 )
Dr. R. Katznelson ( CPSO# 78825 )
Dr. A. Marinov ( CPSO# 79687 )

Business Address:
110 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 3 EB 317
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
EN3 451-200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Ground Floor, Room 405
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Corporation Name: Drs. Clarke/Katznelson/Marinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Clarke ( CPSO# 79400 )
Dr. R. Katznelson ( CPSO# 78825 )
Dr. A. Marinov ( CPSO# 79687 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 287-0990

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Apr 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Rita Katznelson may practice medicine independently in anaesthesiology,
            only.