Kauffman-Schenker, Tammy Fern (CPSO#: 63838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1881 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y4
Phone: (416) 665-2900
Fax: (416) 665-2021
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kauffman-Schenker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kauffman-Schenker ( CPSO# 63838 )

Business Address:
1881 Steeles Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y4
Phone Number: (416) 665-2900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMMY FERN KAUFFMAN-SCHENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUFFMAN-SCHENKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992