Kaufman, Miriam Elizabeth (CPSO#: 50893)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: SickKids Health Records Department 555 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 19 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2018