Kaul, William Henry (CPSO#: 27631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 410
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 884-9601
Fax: (905) 884-5390
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tom Kaul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kaul ( CPSO# 82447 )
Dr. W. Kaul ( CPSO# 27631 )
Dr. E. McCarvill ( CPSO# 88699 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5094

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM HENRY KAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1975