Kaur, Navpreet (CPSO#: 88017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Eugenio Maria De Hostos University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Castle Oaks Medical Centre
Unit 70
225 Castle Oaks Crossing
Brampton ON  L6P 3X3
Phone: (905) 794-4994
Fax: (905) 794-7994
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaur ( CPSO# 88017 )

Business Address:
Castle Oaks Medical Centre
70 - 225 Castle Oaks Crossing
Brampton ON  L6P 3X3
Phone Number: (647) 919-9946

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVPREET KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011