Kaushal, Anu (CPSO#: 69178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 489-2106
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anu Kaushal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kaushal ( CPSO# 69178 )

Business Address:
Uptown Health Centre
8 - 9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Business Address:
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 931-2681

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANU KAUSHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUSHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997