Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kavadias, Angela Antonia (CPSO#: 70820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C
20 Vogell Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K4
Phone: (905) 237-7644
Fax: (905) 237-8213
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA ANTONIA KAVADIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAVADIAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1999