Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kavalsky, Dennis Mark (CPSO#: 57574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
337 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H7
Phone: (905) 549-1246
Fax: (905) 547-2424
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Kavalsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kavalsky ( CPSO# 57574 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
337 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 1H7
Phone Number: (905) 549-1246

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS MARK KAVALSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAVALSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986