Kavanagh, Brian Patrick Walter (CPSO#: 61533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Critical Care
2nd Floor Atrium Wing, Room 2830A
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6860
Fax: (416) 813-5313
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN PATRICK WALTER KAVANAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAVANAGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992