Kavanagh, John (CPSO#: 107410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kavanagh ( CPSO# 107410)
Dr. G. O'Kane ( CPSO# 108292)

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  John  Kavanagh  may  practise  diagnostic  radiology with University
                  Health  Network,  Mount Sinai Hospital and Women's  College  Hospital  in
                  Toronto, Ontario, while  under  supervision  coordinated  by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College. 

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires on December  31,
                  2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Kavanagh's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the  required  reports to the College by the due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Kavanagh's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College  finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Kavanagh's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is  issued on July 1, 2017, and will expire on or before
                  December 31, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.