Kavcic, John Michael (CPSO#: 65348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Slovenian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
20 Losson Road
Cheektowaga NY  14227
United States
Phone: (716) 558-7727

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL KAVCIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAVCIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993