Kaveri Selvan, Kaveri Manian (CPSO#: 94835)

Current Status: Suspended as of 01 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Kaveri Selvan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kaveri Selvan ( CPSO# 94835 )

Business Address:
Queen's Urgent Care and Medical Centre
Unit 20
263 Queens Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 4K6
Phone Number: (905) 497-2273

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 01 Dec 2017


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2017 Active

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Nov 2017
Summary:

On November 6, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kaveri Manian Kaveri Selvan 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
  
Dr. Kaveri Selvan received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from 
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) in February, 2011. Between 
August, 2011 and July 2012, he practised part-time at the Bur Oak Medical Centre (“BOMC”).  
 
Disgraceful, Dishonourable, or Unprofessional Conduct  
 
In the late evening of November, 2012, Dr. Kaveri Selvan returned home from work to find out 
that a family member had unexpectedly left the family home with his two young children. Dr. 
Kaveri Selvan was advised that to secure the return of his children, he would need to bring a 
motion before family court and provide support for his position that the children should be 
placed in his care and custody.  
 
The next day, Dr. Kaveri Selvan went to BOMC and showed the assistant on duty photographs 
on his phone of his family member’s consultation report prepared by her treating specialist at the 
hospital. Dr. Kaveri Selvan asked if there was a copy of this report in the family member’s 
BOMC chart. He was advised that the family member’s chart did not contain a copy of the 
report.  
 
Without her consent, Dr. Kaveri Selvan then requested the family member’s records and signed 
his own name above the line that says “Signature of Patient” on the requisition form. The 
requisition was subsequently faxed to the hospital by BOMC.  
 
Dr. Kaveri Selvan left BOMC with copies of some records from the family member’s BOMC 
chart, containing her personal health information. He did not have the family member’s consent 
to receive her records from the hospital or BOMC. He did not return to BOMC to retrieve copies 
of the hospital records that were the subject of the requisition he had signed.  
 
On the same day, Dr. Kaveri Selvan also requested and received a copy of his family member’s 
prescription history from the Bur Oak Discount Pharmacy without her consent.  
 
On the following day, Dr. Kaveri Selvan filed an emergency motion in the family court seeking 
the return of his children and attached copies of the family member’s medical records he 
received from BOMC and from the pharmacy. He did not have the consent of the family member 
to file these records with the court. He was not represented by a lawyer at the time. Dr. Kaveri 
Selvan was initially not successful in securing the return of his children, despite his motion and 
continued proceedings before the court.  
 
Dr. Kaveri Selvan subsequently obtained a letter from BOMC, dated November 16, 2012, 
including information about his family member, which was written on BOMC’s primary 
physician’s letterhead, bearing the primary physician’s stamp and what appeared to be the 
primary physician’s signature. He did not have the consent of the family member to obtain this 
letter. 
 
 
In the next two months, Dr. Kaveri Selvan brought a new motion before the court for the return 
of his children and included copies of the family member’s medical and pharmacy records and a 
copy of the November 16, 2012 letter. He did not have the consent of the family member to file 
these records with the court.  
 
Pursuant to court orders, custody of Dr. Kaveri Selvan’s children alternated between Dr. Kaveri 
Selvan and the family member in 2013. In March, 2014, the court granted Dr. Kaveri temporary 
sole custody of the children. The court’s order remains in force. While Dr. Kaveri’s paramount 
concern  at  the  time  was  the  safety  of  his  children,  he  acknowledges  his  actions  should  have 
respected the family member’s privacy in her personal health information.  
  
Disposition  
 
On November 6, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs 
that: 
 
 - The Registrar suspend Dr. Kaveri Selvan’s certificate of registration for two (2) months, 
   commencing December 1, 2017. 
 - Dr. Kaveri Selvan, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete, within six 
   (6) months of the date of this Order, the following program: 
    -  Individualized instruction in medical ethics satisfactory to the College, with an 
       instructor selected by the College. 
 - Dr. Kaveri Selvan appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 - Dr. Kaveri Selvan pay costs to the College for a one day hearing in the amount of $5,500.00 
   within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Motion: July 19, 2017 Hearing Dates: November 6, 2017