Kavouris, Vasilios (CPSO#: 61233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit D2
125 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 1H6
Phone: (416) 253-0632
Fax: (416) 253-4853
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VASILIOS KAVOURIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAVOURIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 24 Jan 2005

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Aug 2004
Summary:

 On August 23, 2004, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kavouris( admission and found him to have 
 committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to 
 the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional in that he become involved in 
 an intense emotional relationship with a woman who had been his patient for approximately six 
 years and whose husband and children were also his patients.  

The Committee ordered the 
 following:

(1)	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Kavouris( 
 certificate of registration for a period of nine months commencing August 24, 2004, four months of 
 which will be suspended upon Dr. Kavouris( successful completion to the satisfaction of the 
 Registrar of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario of the College Medical Ethics and 
 Informed Consent Course and the College Boundaries Course; and

(2)	The Discipline Committee 
 directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 23, 2004