Kawai, Susan Harumi (CPSO#: 65199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Phone: (905) 846-9255
Fax: (905) 846-2525
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN HARUMI KAWAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993