Kawakami, Jun (CPSO#: 72187)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Hong and Jun Kawakami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 9 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010