Kawam, Michael Philip (CPSO#: 63553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 969-9742
Fax: (613) 969-7166
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.P. Kawam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kawam ( CPSO# 63553 )

Business Address:
201 - 274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 969-9742

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PHILIP KAWAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992