Kawamura, Nao (CPSO#: 71630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Calgary AB  T3E 7M9
Phone: 403-870-0723

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAO KAWAMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWAMURA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010