Kawashima, Jun (CPSO#: 64354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUN KAWASHIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWASHIMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991