Kawun, Ulana Bohdanka (CPSO#: 72378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 283-7338
Fax: (416) 283-4083
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ulana B. Kawun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Kawun ( CPSO# 72378 )

Business Address:
Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 283-7338

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ULANA BOHDANKA KAWUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2004