Kay, John Michael (CPSO#: 30281)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster University Medical Centre 1200 Main Street West Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 22 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014