Kay, Lloyd Rex Kalman (CPSO#: 59941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Glengrove Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4R 1P3
Phone: (416) 482-4518
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 4165864800 Ext. 8374
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LLOYD REX KALMAN KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989