Kayumi, Adam Shukur (CPSO#: 70569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Hindi, Persian, Urdu

Education:Kabul University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brittany Glen Medical
Unit 102
5602 Tenth Line West
Mississauga ON  L5M 7L9
Phone: (905) 858-9393
Fax: (905) 858-8960
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Kayumi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kayumi ( CPSO# 70569 )

Business Address:
Brittany Glen Medical
Unit 102
5602 Tenth Line West
Mississauga ON  L5M 7L9
Phone Number: (905) 858-9393

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM SHUKUR KAYUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAYUMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998