Kazemi, Ghazaleh (CPSO#: 90686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
Third Floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHAZALEH KAZEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2014