Kazerouni, Abdul Hamid (CPSO#: 108603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pathology- Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession street
Hamilton ON  L8V1C3
Phone: (905) 5212100 Ext. 42063
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Abdul Hamid Kazerouni may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pathology
                        and Molecular Medicine, McMaster University, in which Dr. Kazerouni
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Kazerouni  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Kazerouni's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Kazerouni's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 1, 2016, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Kazerouni's academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.