Kazmi, Asif Abbas (CPSO#: 75569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-0800
Fax: (705) 797-0900
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kazmi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kazmi ( CPSO# 75569 )

Business Address:
Suite 211
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-0800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIF ABBAS KAZMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005