Kealey, Alayne (CPSO#: 76257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia M3
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kealey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kealey ( CPSO# 76257 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAYNE KEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEALEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006