Kearon, Michael Clive (CPSO#: 56073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411 Ext. 42640
Fax: (905) 574-7625
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clive Kearon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kearon ( CPSO# 56073 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-73
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CLIVE KEARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEARON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1986