Keating, Armand (CPSO#: 30524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue, OPG6-325
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4595
Fax: (416) 946-4530
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armand Keating Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Keating ( CPSO# 30524 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 5-303
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4595

Business Address:
Suite 5KD417
60 Leonard Drive
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 634-7044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARMAND KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1978