Keating, Frances Mary (CPSO#: 57171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: O'Neil, Frances Mary (used until: 27 May 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 River Road
Thessalon ON  P0R 1L0
Phone: (705) 842-2905
Fax: (705) 842-0038
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frances Keating Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Keating ( CPSO# 57171 )

Business Address:
333 River Road
Thessalon ON  P0R 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 842-2905

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Shore Health Network Blind River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES MARY KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1991