Keats, Karen Linda (CPSO#: 68708)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Apr 1995 to 11 May 1995
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 1997 to 20 Oct 1997
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1997