Kebaish, Khaled Mohamed Soliman (CPSO#: 69597)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 14 Jul 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 14 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1996 to 14 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1997 to 14 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Aug 1999