Keddy-Grant, Jill Alison (CPSO#: 57327)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Keddy, Jill Alison (used until: 09 Sep 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2000