Keefe, Peter Huntley (CPSO#: 29193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 Madison Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2S1
Phone: (416) 969-9780
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER HUNTLEY KEEFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEEFE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1983