Keeler, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 91603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

104-25 Elm St.
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Canada
Phone: 226-210-3773
Fax: 519-914-0122
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keeler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Keeler ( CPSO# 91603 )

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Business Address:
25 Elm Street
Suite 104
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Phone Number: (519) 631-6641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE KEELER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEELER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012