Keeler, Harvey Samuel Grant (CPSO#: 19127)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012