Keeling, Clifford John (CPSO#: 18483)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 667
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5R4
Phone: (519) 376-6519
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1999