Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Keely, Erin Joanne (CPSO#: 54104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 88333
Fax: (613) 738-8396
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.J. Keely Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Keely ( CPSO# 54104 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Suite 4-01
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN JOANNE KEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEELY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991