Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Keenan, Robert James (CPSO#: 54189)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992