Keenan, Sean Patrick (CPSO#: 54079)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2003