Keesal, Nancy Beth (CPSO#: 59353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 604
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-0630
Fax: (416) 413-9689
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 20 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY BETH KEESAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEESAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1990