Kegel, Stefan Paul Leopold (CPSO#: 98133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1320-130 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: (416) 777-9365
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3471 Lake Shore Blvd. West
Etobicoke ON  M8W 1N2
Canada
Phone: (647) 352-5533
Fax: (647) 352-5531
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Kegel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kegel ( CPSO# 98133 )

Business Address:
1320 - 130 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8
Phone Number: (416) 777-9355

Business Address:
3471 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8W 1N2
Phone Number: (647) 352-5533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN PAUL LEOPOLD KEGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEGEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014