Keil, William Ernest (CPSO#: 14853)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 29 May 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1954
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 May 1987

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Mar 1983
Summary:

 In March 1983, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Keil guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Keil's licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 24 Feb 1987
Hearing Date(s): 14 Mar 1983