Keith, Brian Reginald (CPSO#: 29718)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1989
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 10 Apr 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001