Keith, Fraser Maclennan (CPSO#: 52355)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1989