Keith, Julia Lee (CPSO#: 79148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
Room E403
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 88055
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Keith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keith ( CPSO# 79148 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
Room E403
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 481-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA LEE KEITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2009