Kelen, Gabor David (CPSO#: 31901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Emergency Medicine
The Johns Hopkins Hospital
Suite 6-100
1830 E Monument Street
Baltimore MD  21287
United States
Phone: (410) 955-8191

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABOR DAVID KELEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1980